Schacter, Sayre Henry (CPSO#: 23901)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:McGill University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 17 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Nov 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1991