Schaffenburg, Jocelyn Eleanor Rebecca (CPSO#: 31467)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jocelyn Schaffenburg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 208 430 The Boardwalk Waterloo, ON N2T 0C1 Tel: 5197420107
Instructions: Please contact Dr. Janie Penhearow for medical record inquiries
Date Received: 28 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015