Schamuhn, Ruth-Ann Marie (CPSO#: 98383)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
24 CF Health Services Centre
PO Box 1000 Stn Forces
8 Wing Trenton
National Defence
Astra ON  K0K 3W0
Phone: (613)392-2811 Ext. 3480
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUTH-ANN MARIE SCHAMUHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHAMUHN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014