Scharf, Lorne Handel (CPSO#: 76851)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Glengarry Memorial Hospital
Alexandria ON  K0C 1A0
Canada
Phone: (613) 525-2222
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Cornwall Health Care Centre
Suite 128
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 4M4
Canada
Phone: (613) 936-1564
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lorne Scharf Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Scharf ( CPSO# 76851 )

Business Address:
Cornwall Health Care Centre
Suite 128
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 4M4
Phone Number: (613) 936-8717

Business Address:
Glengarry Memorial Hospital
20260 Country Road 43
Alexandria ON  K0C 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 525-2222

Business Address:
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 26 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORNE HANDEL SCHARF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHARF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2001