Scharf, Nathan Dan (CPSO#: 56001)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Youthdale Treatment Centre
227 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Phone: (416) 363-3751 Ext. 2021
Fax: (416) 363-7945
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Scharf Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Scharf ( CPSO# 56001 )

Business Address:
Youthdale Treatment Centre
227 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Phone Number: (416) 363-3751

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHAN DAN SCHARF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHARF is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1985