Scharfenberger, Angela Veronika (CPSO#: 75781)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Jan 2001
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2001 to 31 Mar 2001
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jun 2003