Schattner, Ariah Joshua (CPSO#: 72777)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
R S McLaughlin Durham
Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 2805
Fax: (905) 721-6103
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ariah Joshua Schattner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Schattner ( CPSO# 72777 )

Business Address:
R S McLaughlin Durham
Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 23 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARIAH JOSHUA SCHATTNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHATTNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2004