Schatzdorfer, Julie Elizabeth (CPSO#: 52609)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 2536
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE ELIZABETH SCHATZDORFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHATZDORFER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1984