Schechter-Finkelstein, Tal Tova (CPSO#: 82026)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Feb 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Finkelstein-Schechter, Tal Tova (used until: 08 Feb 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The Hebrew University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Div Paed Haematology Oncology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6906
Fax: (416) 813-5327
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Feb 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Nov 2004 to 24 Jan 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 25 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 08 Jul 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 09 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jan 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 May 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Tal Tova Schechter-Finkelstein may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,   Division   of  Haematology/Oncology,  University  of
                        Toronto,  in  which  Dr. Schechter-Finkelstein  holds  an  academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Schechter-
                  Finkelstein no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.