Schefter, Tracey Elizabeth (CPSO#: 67743)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2000