Scheinemann, Katrin (CPSO#: 83942)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 07 Nov 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Wurzburg, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Scheinemann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 10 2014

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2006 to 21 Feb 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 22 Feb 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2013