Scheinfeld, Ben Avi (CPSO#: 61156)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Feb 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
19020 Fort Street
Riverview MI  48193
United States
Phone: (734) 362-5100
Fax: (734) 362-5147

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 21 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEN AVI SCHEINFELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHEINFELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 02 Aug 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 1992