Schelfaut, Sebastiaan Hilaire Rita (CPSO#: 102483)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Katholieke Universiteit Leuven, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 21 Mar 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 22 Mar 2014 to 30 Apr 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2014