Schenke, Megan Elsa (CPSO#: 99670)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay St
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: 613-732-2811
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Yukon

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGAN ELSA SCHENKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHENKE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2012 to 11 Jan 2013
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Mar 2013 to 05 Apr 2013
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2013