Schep, Gerald Neil (CPSO#: 51669)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204B
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 898-3710
Fax: (905) 898-4401
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERALD NEIL SCHEP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHEP is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Nov 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1998