Schertzer, Stephen Jonathan (CPSO#: 57567)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 25 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Nov 1998