Scheufler, Peter William (CPSO#: 59659)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
165 Dundas Street West
Suite 500
Mississauga ON  L5B 2N6
Phone: (905) 896-1244
Fax: (905) 896-1290
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Reproductive Care Centre
2180 Meadowvale Blvd
Mississauga ON  L5N 5S3
Canada
Phone: (905) 816-9822
Fax: (905) 816-9833
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.W. Scheufler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Scheufler ( CPSO# 59659 )

Business Address:
500 - 165 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2N6
Phone Number: (905) 896-1245

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER WILLIAM SCHEUFLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHEUFLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1989