Schieda, Nicola (CPSO#: 84545)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1053 Carline Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Schieda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Schieda ( CPSO# 84545 )
Dr. A. Tsampalieros ( CPSO# 84969 )

Business Address:
1053 Carline Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLA SCHIEDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHIEDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2012