Schiedel, Jonathan Jeffrey (CPSO#: 77611)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Marys Medical Clinic
P O Box 1120
268 Maiden Lane
St Marys ON  N4X 1B7
Phone: (519) 284-3450
Fax: (519) 284-4471
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.J. Schiedel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Schiedel ( CPSO# 77611 )

Business Address:
St Mary's Medical Clinic
268 Maiden Lane
PO Box 1120
St Marys ON  N4X 1B7
Phone Number: (519) 284-3450

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN JEFFREY SCHIEDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHIEDEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2004