Schiff, David Peter Edward (CPSO#: 26495)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph Medical Imaging
Suite 206
55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone: 226-314-0778
Fax: 519-763-8242
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David P. Schiff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Schiff ( CPSO# 26495 )

Business Address:
Guelph Medical Imaging
Suite 206
55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone Number: (519) 767-0220

Business Address:
Guelph Medical Imaging
11 - 33 Farley Drive
Guelph ON  N1L 0B7

Business Address:
103 - 83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 767-0550

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID PETER EDWARD SCHIFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHIFF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 May 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1978