Schiff, Michael Dov (CPSO#: 45737)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 06 Jun 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rudd Clinic
Unit 400
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone: (416) 597-0997
Fax: (416) 6136044
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Schiff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schiff ( CPSO# 45737 )

Business Address:
Rudd Clinic
Unit 400
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 597-0997

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 05 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 05 Jun 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 05 Feb 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Michael  Dov  Schiff  may  practise  medicine  independently in outpatient
            gastroenterology.