Schiff, Renee Lynne (CPSO#: 82370)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 May 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cardio Study
Suite 401
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone: (416) 409-7771
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Oct 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RENEE LYNNE SCHIFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHIFF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 May 2005 to 03 Jun 2005
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2016