Schiffer, Laura Jean (CPSO#: 60864)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
3292 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M2M 4J5
Phone: (416) 229-4179
Fax: (416) 222-8088
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

247 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 273-3045
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

300 John St, unit 203
Thornhill ON  L3T 5W4
Canada
Phone: (905) 764-0188
Fax: (905) 764-0189
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Willowdale ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laura Schiffer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Schiffer ( CPSO# 60864 )

Business Address:
247 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 273-3045

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 22 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA JEAN SCHIFFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHIFFER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1990