Schiller, Petra Patricia (CPSO#: 65431)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
406 - 1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Phone: (416) 492-3613
Fax: (416) 492-0635
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 406
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Canada
Phone: (416) 492-3613
Fax: (416) 492-0635
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Schiller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Schiller ( CPSO# 65431 )

Business Address:
406 - 1100 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 492-3613

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETRA PATRICIA SCHILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHILLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993