Schipper, Kristine Marie (CPSO#: 69057)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chelsey Medical Clinic
P O Box 389
Chesley ON  N0G 1L0
Phone: (519) 363-3220
Fax: (519) 363-0385
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTINE MARIE SCHIPPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHIPPER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1997