Schirmer, Nicholas (CPSO#: 88537)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McGill University Health Centre
1650 Cedar Ave.
montreal QC  H3G 1A4
Phone: 5149341934

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS SCHIRMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHIRMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010