Schlosser, Robert Jonathan (CPSO#: 58098)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
17 - 531 Atkinson Avenue
Thornhill ON  L4J 8L7
Phone: (905) 763-8660
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Schlosser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Schlosser ( CPSO# 58098 )

Business Address:
17 - 531 Atkinson Avenue
Thornhill ON  L4J 8L7
Phone Number: (905) 763-8660

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 03 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JONATHAN SCHLOSSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHLOSSER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1988