Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Schmalfuss, Peter Ernst Hans (CPSO#: 20570)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: (800) 775-0093 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 25 Aug 2011


Instructions: Patients can leave a voicemail message at (416) 256-7850 and Dr. Schmalfuss's assistant will make the appropriate arrangements.
Date Received: 16 Aug 2011

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1966
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2014

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 30, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Schmalfuss has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario of any other jurisdiction.