Schmidt, Barbara Kristina (CPSO#: 51672)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Feb 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Feb 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:George August Univ of Gottingen, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3400 Spruce Street, Ravdin 8
Hospital of Univ. of Pennsylvania
Philadelphia PA  19104
United States
Phone: (215) 662-3228

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA KRISTINA SCHMIDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHMIDT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1989