Schmidt, Jordan Preben (CPSO#: 72504)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
Suite B2-414
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 646-6106
Fax: (519) 646-6213
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jordan Schmidt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Schmidt ( CPSO# 72504 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
Room B2-414
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 646-6106

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JORDAN PREBEN SCHMIDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHMIDT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003