Schmidt, Matthias Helge (CPSO#: 68160)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2008 to 21 Mar 2008
Elective Trainee - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 2008 to 25 Jul 2008
Elective Trainee - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jul 2008