Schmidt, Michael David (CPSO#: 93758)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: 705-523-7100
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Schmidt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schmidt ( CPSO# 93758 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone Number: (705) 647-8121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Manitoulin Health Centre,Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
North Shore Health Network Blind River
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID SCHMIDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHMIDT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2016