Schnarr, Jennifer Jane (CPSO#: 79299)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
18 Pine Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone: (519) 571-0822
Fax: (519) 571-1210
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Schnarr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Schnarr ( CPSO# 79299 )

Business Address:
207 - 18 Pine Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone Number: (519) 571-0822

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER JANE SCHNARR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHNARR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009