Schneeweiss, Suzan (CPSO#: 58597)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6232
Fax: (416) 813-5043
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUZAN SCHNEEWEISS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHNEEWEISS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1988