Schneider, Andre Perillier (CPSO#: 101771)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidade Federal de Sao Paulo, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Brazil

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 22 Jan 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jan 2016