Schneider, Arielle Jayden-Anne (CPSO#: 106714)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
Hamilton Family Health Team
200 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A9
Phone: (905) 526-1606
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARIELLE JAYDEN-ANNE SCHNEIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHNEIDER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2017