Schneider, Elizabeth Ann (CPSO#: 51960)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
65 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B8
Phone: (705) 671-1081
Fax: (705) 671-1547
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 06 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANN SCHNEIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHNEIDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1988