Schneider, Kathleen Claire (CPSO#: 59559)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 606
1 St Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4T 2V7
Phone: (416) 963-8266
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rouge Valley Health System
Centenary Site 6th floor
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 1991
Fax: (416) 281-7320
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Schneider Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Schneider ( CPSO# 59559 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health Centre
6th Floor
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 963-8266

Business Address:
606 - 1 St. Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4T 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 963-8266

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHLEEN CLAIRE SCHNEIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHNEIDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1989