Schneider, Kenneth Michael (CPSO#: 58022)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone: (519) 253-5253 Ext. 58540
Electoral District: 01

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH MICHAEL SCHNEIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHNEIDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 1988