Schneider, Margaret Ella (CPSO#: 55523)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Feb 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Anaesthesia Associates
439 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N4
Phone: (519) 744-7361
Fax: (519) 744-7363
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gareth Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Jones ( CPSO# 55549 )
Dr. M. Schneider ( CPSO# 55523 )

Business Address:
2 Park Avenue West
Elmira ON  N3B 1L1
Phone Number: (519) 669-5493

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET ELLA SCHNEIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHNEIDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1985 to 15 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1990