Schneider, Raphael Peter (CPSO#: 95592)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Albert Ludwig Univ at Freiburg, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Division of Adult Neurology
399 Bathurst St. 5WW441
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-603-5800 Ext. 6262
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 29 Jul 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAPHAEL PETER SCHNEIDER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SCHNEIDER is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. SCHNEIDER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SCHNEIDER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SCHNEIDER shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SCHNEIDER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SCHNEIDER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Neurology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 29 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018