Schneider, Rayfel (CPSO#: 53262)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5828
Fax: (416) 813-4989
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYFEL SCHNEIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHNEIDER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985