Schnider, Denise Lynn (CPSO#: 52391)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
217 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G8
Phone: (519) 759-1914
Fax: (519) 759-3605
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Denise Schnider Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Schnider ( CPSO# 52391 )

Business Address:
217 Terrace Hill Street
Suite 208
Brantford ON  N3R 1G8
Phone Number: (519) 759-3605

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENISE LYNN SCHNIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHNIDER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1989