Schnurr, Clare Marie (CPSO#: 63680)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 1992


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kalihi Palama Health Center
915 North King St
Honolulu HI  96817
United States
Phone: 808-848-1438
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moroz-Schnurr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 26 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Hawaii


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jul 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. CLARE MARIE SCHNURR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHNURR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1992