Schnurr, Lawrence Peter (CPSO#: 45649)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
17 Lakeshore Drive
Box 1360
Morrisburg ON  K0C 1X0
Phone: (613) 543-4550
Fax: (613) 543-4550
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE PETER SCHNURR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHNURR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1988