Schoales, Blair Robert (CPSO#: 51591)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
1265 Arthur Street East
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 6E7
Phone: (807) 623-3744
Fax: (807) 622-6885
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Blair Schoales Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Schoales ( CPSO# 51591 )

Business Address:
302 - 1265 Arthur Street East
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 6E7
Phone Number: (807) 623-3744

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BLAIR ROBERT SCHOALES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHOALES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1985