Schofield, Sally Ann (CPSO#: 62836)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Apr 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Apr 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6951
Fax: (416) 756-6080
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sally Schofield Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Schofield ( CPSO# 62836 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6951

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALLY ANN SCHOFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHOFIELD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1993