Schofield, Scott Brady (CPSO#: 101796)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Adelaide, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2013 to 08 Sep 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 09 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jul 2014