Schogt, Barbara (CPSO#: 52488)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Dec 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 1985

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
481 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2E9
Phone: (416) 962-6600
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA SCHOGT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHOGT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1985
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 26 Mar 2004
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 26 Dec 2004

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Mar 2004
Summary:

 On March 26, 2004, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Schogt to have committed an act of 
 professional misconduct in that Dr. Schogt entered into a relationship with a former patient and 
 engaged in conduct that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  

The Committee ordered the following 
 penalty:

1.	The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Schogt(s certificate of 
 registration for a period of nine months commencing immediately;

2.	The Discipline Committee 
 directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Schogt(s certificate of registration for a further three 
 months, to be suspended upon Dr. Schogt successfully completing College-approved courses in 
 boundaries and ethics;

3.	The Discipline Committee orders Dr. Schogt to attend before the panel 
 to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register; and;

4.	The 
 Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Mar 26, 2004