Scholey, James William (CPSO#: 44827)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Mar 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
8N - 859
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5093
Fax: (416) 340-4999
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James William Scholey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Scholey ( CPSO# 44827 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
Division of Nephrology
8N-859 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5093

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nephrology Effective: 05 Sep 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES WILLIAM SCHOLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHOLEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1989